GAB: Change of personnel
FLC Mining Investment & Asset Management Joint Stock Company received the resignation letter from Mr. Nguyen Duc Cong as member of BODs cum Chairman of the BOD.
HOSE
> GMC: Change of personnel (22/09/2022)
> GSP: The resignation of a member of the Supervisory Board (21/09/2022)
> CVT: Change in Personnel (21/09/2022)
> HID: Change of personnel (21/09/2022)
> ASG: Change in Personnel (21/09/2022)
> FLC: Change of personnel (21/09/2022)
> HHV: Receiving Operation Registration Certificate of Representative Office (21/09/2022)
> TCD: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> LM8: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> TVB: Change in Personnel (19/09/2022)