ASG: Change in Personnel
ASG Corporation announces the change in personnel as follows:
Resignation:
Mr. Le Tien Dong
- Resigned position: Head of Financial & Accountant Board
- Reason (if any):
- Effective date: September 20, 2022.
HOSE
> FLC: Change of personnel (21/09/2022)
> HHV: Receiving Operation Registration Certificate of Representative Office (21/09/2022)
> TCD: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> LM8: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> TVB: Change in Personnel (19/09/2022)
> SVC: Change in personnel (19/09/2022)
> GEG: Change in personnel (19/09/2022)
> FLC: Change of personnel (19/09/2022)
> BMC: Change in Personnel (19/09/2022)