FLC: Change of personnel
FLC Group Joint Stock Company announced personnel change as follows:
- Approving the resignation of Mr. La Quy Hien as Deputy CEO as from September 19, 2022.
HOSE
> HHV: Receiving Operation Registration Certificate of Representative Office (21/09/2022)
> TCD: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> LM8: Change in Personnel (20/09/2022)
> TVB: Change in Personnel (19/09/2022)
> SVC: Change in personnel (19/09/2022)
> GEG: Change in personnel (19/09/2022)
> FLC: Change of personnel (19/09/2022)
> BMC: Change in Personnel (19/09/2022)
> ASG: Change of personnel (19/09/2022)