DVSC: Notice of change of personnel
Daiviet Securities Incorporation (DVSC) announces the change of personnel as follows:
- On October 12, 2020, the Board of Supervisors of Daiviet Securities Incorporation held a meeting and unanimously elected Mr. Nguyen Truong Thanh as Head of the Board of Supervisors.
HOSE
> DAS: Amending the depository member certificate (13/10/2020)
> SSV: Chief Accountant appointment (13/10/2020)
> VPA: Change in personnel (12/10/2020)
> PLP: Member of BOD resignation (12/10/2020)
> NQN: Resignation letter of Member of Supervisory Board (12/10/2020)
> HDBS: Personnel change (12/10/2020)
> DAS: Personnel change (12/10/2020)
> AMS: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (09/10/2020)
> SKH: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> TNG: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)