DAS: Personnel change
On October 07, 2020, Dong A Securities Company Ltd. issued a decision to approve the termination of the position of member of Council members, and the resignation of the position of Chief Executive Officer (CEO) for Mr. Duong The Quang from October 10, 2020.
HOSE
> AMS: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (09/10/2020)
> SKH: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> TNG: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> VSA: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> SSC: Change of personnel (09/10/2020)
> HSL: Change of personnel (09/10/2020)
> DHM: Change of personnel (09/10/2020)
> HAS: Notice of change of personnel (09/10/2020)
> SBA: Deputy CEO appointment (09/10/2020)
> DHN: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (08/10/2020)