DAS: Amending the depository member certificate
On October 09, 2020, Dong A Securities Company Ltd. (DAS) received Depository Member Certificate No.13/GCNTVLK-2 by the Vietnam Securities Depository, amended for the second time effective from October 07, 2020. Accordingly, the Company’s Legal Representative is Mr. Luong Ngoc Quy, Chairman of the Board of Members.
HOSE
> SSV: Chief Accountant appointment (13/10/2020)
> VPA: Change in personnel (12/10/2020)
> PLP: Member of BOD resignation (12/10/2020)
> NQN: Resignation letter of Member of Supervisory Board (12/10/2020)
> HDBS: Personnel change (12/10/2020)
> DAS: Personnel change (12/10/2020)
> AMS: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (09/10/2020)
> SKH: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> TNG: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)
> VSA: Change in personnel (09/10/2020)