CTD: Change of personnel
Coteccons Construction Joint Stock Company received the resignation letter from Ms. Nguyen Quoc Hiep as member of BODs as October 12, 2020.
HOSE
> CTD: Personnel change (14/10/2020)
> MLC: Change in personnel (13/10/2020)
> VEC: Change in personnel (13/10/2020)
> TDN: Change in personnel (13/10/2020)
> SCS: Personnel change (13/10/2020)
> S55: Change in personnel (13/10/2020)
> DVSC: Notice of change of personnel (13/10/2020)
> DAS: Amending the depository member certificate (13/10/2020)
> SSV: Chief Accountant appointment (13/10/2020)
> VPA: Change in personnel (12/10/2020)