VRC: Change in Personnel
VRC Real Estate and Investment Joint Stock Company announces the change in personnel as follows:
Appointment:
Mrs. Nguyen Ngoc Quynh Nhu
- Former position in the organization: a member of the BOD
- Newly appointed position: Chairman of the BOD
- Term:
- Effective date: January 16, 2023.
Resignation:
Mr. Nguyen Thanh Hung
- Resigned position: Chairman of the BOD
- Reason (if any):
HOSE
> LBM: Change in Personnel (18/01/2023)
> CTS: Change in Personnel (18/01/2023)
> VRC: Change in personnel (18/01/2023)
> DAG: Change in personnel (18/01/2023)
> VMD: Change in personnel (17/01/2023)
> SHI: Change in Personnel (17/01/2023)
> HOT: Change in Personnel (17/01/2023)
> TCD: Change of representative of contributed capital (16/01/2023)
> SRC: Change in personnel (13/01/2023)
> HAI: Change in personnel (13/01/2023)