VRC: Change in personnel
VRC Real Estate and Investment Joint Stock Company received the resignation letter from Mr. Nguyen Thanh Hung as Chairman of the BOD as from January 16, 2023.
HOSE
> DAG: Change in personnel (18/01/2023)
> VMD: Change in personnel (17/01/2023)
> SHI: Change in Personnel (17/01/2023)
> HOT: Change in Personnel (17/01/2023)
> TCD: Change of representative of contributed capital (16/01/2023)
> SRC: Change in personnel (13/01/2023)
> HAI: Change in personnel (13/01/2023)
> AGM: Change in Personnel (13/01/2023)
> TIX: Change in Personnel (13/01/2023)
> FLC: Change in Personnel (13/01/2023)