TCT: Change in Personnel
Tay Ninh Cable Car Tour Company announces the change in personnel as follows:
Appointment:
Mr. Le Phuoc Vinh
- Former position in the organization
- Newly appointed position: person in charge of corporate governance cum secretary
- Term:
- Effective date: March 01, 2023.
Resignation:
Mr. Nguyen Thanh Tuan
- Resigned position: person in charge of corporate governance cum secretary
- Reason (if any):
HOSE
> TCD: Change of representative of contributed capital in Helios (07/03/2023)
> FRT: Change in Personnel (07/03/2023)
> FRT: Change in personnel (07/03/2023)
> VHC: Change in personnel (07/03/2023)
> TDP: Change in personnel (06/03/2023)
> PLP: Establishing a representative office in Nghe An (06/03/2023)
> PGI: Change in personnel (06/03/2023)
> FUCVREIT: Change in personnel (03/03/2023)
> TTF: Change in personnel (03/03/2023)
> SVC: Change in personnel (02/03/2023)