SMC: Change of personnel
SMC Trading Investment Joint Stock Company announced personnel change as follows:
- Mr. Dang Huy Hiep replaced Mr. Truong Van Minh as Director cum the Legal representative at SMC Steel Co., ltd.
- Mr. Nguyen Huu Kinh Luan replaced Mr. Truong Van Minh as Director cum the Legal representative at Sendo Steel Co., ltd.
Effective date: October 01, 2022
HOSE
> ACB: Change of personnel (30/08/2022)
> BFC: Change of personnel (30/08/2022)
> AAA: Changes in 7th Representative Office Registration Certificate (30/08/2022)
> KHG: Change of personnel (29/08/2022)
> STG: Change of personnel (29/08/2022)
> ROS: Change in personnel (29/08/2022)
> DQC: Change in personnel (29/08/2022)
> HTL: Change in personnel (29/08/2022)
> SCR: Announcement of re-appointment (29/08/2022)
> PMG: Change of personnel (26/08/2022)