VICS: Person in charge of Corporate Governance appointment
The Board resolution dated May 23, 2022, the BOD of Vietnam Industrial & Commercial Securities Corporation approved the appointment of Mr. Duomg Quang Trung as Person in charge of Corporate Governance from May 23, 2022.
HOSE
> THI: Deputy CEO resignation (26/05/2022)
> PSH: Change in personnel (26/05/2022)
> KOS: Change in personnel (26/05/2022)
> TTB: Change in personnel (25/05/2022)
> FLC: Member of Supervisory Board resignation (25/05/2022)
> THI: Chairman of BOD resignation (24/05/2022)
> CTS: Personnel re-appointment (24/05/2022)
> EIB: Change in Personnel (24/05/2022)
> BBC: CEO reappointment (24/05/2022)
> DCM: Deputy CEO appointment (24/05/2022)