HBS: Change in Personnel
The Board of Directors of Hoa Binh Securities Joint Stock Company (HBS) elected Mr. Tran Kien Cuong, Member of the Board of Directors, as Chairman of the Board of Directors effective from May 10, 2022. Mr. Tran Kien Cuong is also the Company’s Legal Representative.
HOSE
> NLG: Board resolution on the change in personnel (17/05/2022)
> DBD: Notice of disclosure representative (16/05/2022)
> UIC: Notice of member appointment of the BOD (16/05/2022)
> DPG: Notice of member appointment of the Supervisory Board (16/05/2022)
> FDC: Notice of disclosure representative (16/05/2022)
> NHT: Appointment notice of Deputy CEOs (16/05/2022)
> VPB: Change in personnel (13/05/2022)
> TDM: Chief Accountant cum CFO appointment (12/05/2022)
> TDM: Chief Accountant cum CFO resignation (12/05/2022)