GSP: Person in charge of Corporate Governance
The Board resolution dated December 02, 2020, the BOD of International Gas Product Shipping Joint Stock Company approved to appoint Mr. Duong Dinh Quoc Hung as Person in charge of Corporate Governance.
HOSE
> DPR: BOD resolution dated November 27, 2020 (03/12/2020)
> ACB: Announcement of the first trading date (03/12/2020)
> TTB: Report on Outstanding Voting Shares (03/12/2020)
> HUB: Report on Outstanding Voting Shares (03/12/2020)
> NCS: Cancellation of the list of securities owners exercising their rights (03/12/2020)
> Major shareholder to sell entire stake in steel giant Hoa Sen (HSG) (03/12/2020)
> BCF: Board Resolution (03/12/2020)
> ACB: Board Resolution (03/12/2020)
> FUESSVFL: NAV 01 Dec 2020 (03/12/2020)