STT: Change in personnel
On 28/09/2020, Saigontourist Transport Corporation announced the change in personnel as follows: - Ms. Nguyen Thi Phuong Thao has resigned from Secretary of the Board of Directors with effect since 28/9/2020 - Ms. Hoang Thi Hue has been appointed Secretary of the Board of Directors with effect since 28/9/2020
HNX
> DCF: Change in personnel (05/10/2020)
> PDV: Change in personnel (05/10/2020)
> ICG: Change in personnel (05/10/2020)
> NAV: CEO appointment (05/10/2020)
> NDP: Change in personnel (05/10/2020)
> VSN: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (02/10/2020)
> DHN: Change in personnel (02/10/2020)
> DPM: Personnel change (02/10/2020)
> MVB: Change in personnel (02/10/2020)
> HTN: Change of personnel (02/10/2020)