USD: Change in personnel
Soc Trang Public Works Joint Stock Company announced change in personnel as follows: - Mr. Dang Thanh Binh has been appointed Deputy General Manager with effect since 01/09/2020
HNX
> PXT: Member of BOD resignation (07/09/2020)
> KDC: Change of personnel (07/09/2020)
> SFI: Change of personnel (07/09/2020)
> VCBS: Change of personnel (07/09/2020)
> HEM: Change in personnel (07/09/2020)
> HTR: Change in personnel (07/09/2020)
> BCF: Change in personnel (04/09/2020)
> SCR: Change of personnel (04/09/2020)
> PVI: Nomination and self-nomination to supplement members of PVS's Board and Directors for the remaining time of 2017-2022 term of office (04/09/2020)
> CCH: Change in personnel (03/09/2020)