HDBS: Change of personnel
HDB Securities Corporation announced personnel change as follows:
- Approving the resignation of Mr. Tong Minh Tuan as Deputy CEO as from September 11, 2020.
HOSE
> VC3: Change in personnel (14/09/2020)
> LTC: Change in personnel (14/09/2020)
> ART: Change in personnel (11/09/2020)
> UCT: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (11/09/2020)
> VE3: Change in Information Disclosure Officer (11/09/2020)
> HAX: Change of personnel (11/09/2020)
> SCR: Resolution on the appointment Chairman of the BODs. (11/09/2020)
> DCF: Change in personnel (10/09/2020)
> CDP: Change in personnel (10/09/2020)
> VNI: Resignation letter of member of the BOD (10/09/2020)