C47: Person in charge of Corporate Governance appointment
The Board resolution dated June 30, 2020, the BOD of Construction Joint Stock Company 47 approved the appointment of Mr. Nguyen Quang Dung as Person in charge of Corporate Governance of the Company from July 01, 2020.
HOSE
> C47: Assigning the job title of members of Internal Audit Board (10/07/2020)
> HBC: Change of Representative of contributed capital in 479 Hoa Binh JSC (10/07/2020)
> APT: Change in personnel (09/07/2020)
> H11: Change in personnel (09/07/2020)
> CTC: Information disclosure about resignation letter and authorization letter of PDMR (09/07/2020)
> EVF: Change in personnel (09/07/2020)
> NHH: Member of Supervisory Board resignation (09/07/2020)
> DGW: Chairman of BOD resignation (09/07/2020)
> ASM: Member of BOD resignation (09/07/2020)
> MEG: Change in personnel (09/07/2020)