VTC: Change in personnel
VTC Telecommunications JSC announced change in personnel as follows: - Mr. Le Xuan Tien has been dismissed from Chair of the Board term 2015-2019 and General Manager with effect since 25/06/2020 - Mr. Nguyen Thien Loi has been dismissed from Chief of the Supervisory Board term 2015-2019 with effect since 25/06/2020 - Mr. Le Xuan Tien has been elected Chair of the Board term 2020-2025 with effect since 26/06/2020 - Mr. Nguyen Thien Loi has been elected Chief of the Supervisory Board term 2020-2025 with effect since 26/06/2020 - Mr. Bui Van Bang - Deputy General Manager has been appointed General Manager with effect since 01/07/2020
HNX
> FNS: Change of personnel (29/06/2020)
> EIB: Change of personnel (29/06/2020)
> ANV: Change of personnel (29/06/2020)
> HND: Change in personnel (29/06/2020)
> CTB: Resignation letter of member of the BOD (29/06/2020)
> VCP: Change in personnel (29/06/2020)
> CHC: Change in personnel (29/06/2020)
> TTT: Change in personnel (29/06/2020)
> TIS: Change in personnel (26/06/2020)
> DHB: Change in personnel (26/06/2020)