NVT: Change of personnel
Ninh Van Bay Travel Real Estate Joint Stock Company announced personnel change as follows:
- Ms. Ngo Thi Thanh Hai was appointed as the person in charge of corporate governance as from November 12, 2019 to November 11, 2024.
HOSE
> NTF: Change in personnel (31/03/2020)
> TNW: Change in personnel (31/03/2020)
> CMT: Change in personnel (31/03/2020)
> TV3: Change in personnel (31/03/2020)
> NDP: Change in personnel (31/03/2020)
> LDW: Notice of nominating the expected additional members for the Board of Supervisors in the remaining time tem 2018 – 2023 (30/03/2020)
> IBSC: Member of BOD resignation (30/03/2020)
> SACOMBANK - SBS: Personnel change (30/03/2020)
> VCP: Change in personnel (30/03/2020)
> KBSV: Change of personnel (30/03/2020)