SHBS: Change of Director of HCM Branch
SHB Securities Joint Stock Company (SHBS) announced the personnel change as follows:
- Mr. Nguyen The Minh replaced Ms. Le Thi Thu Hien as Director of SHB Securities Joint Stock Company – HCM Branch.
HOSE
> HAX: Information on business license of branch in Ha Noi (10/11/2014)
> E1VFVN30: NAV from 30 Oct 2014 to 6 Nov 2014 (10/11/2014)
> TXM: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (07/11/2014)
> PVI: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (Consolidated) (07/11/2014)
> AAA: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (07/11/2014)
> PTS: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (holding company) (07/11/2014)
> PTS: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (Consolidated) (07/11/2014)
> PVI: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (holding company) (07/11/2014)
> AAA: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (holding company) (07/11/2014)
> INN: Financial Statement Quarter 3/2014 (07/11/2014)